Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Cecchini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1933Born
21 Dec 195724.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Senigallia, Italy
16 Mar 195825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Senigallia, Italy
11 Feb 198653.0AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
11 Feb 198653.0AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
11 Feb 198653.0AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
16 Mar 198653.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
22 Apr 198653.2InstalledBishop of Fano, Italy
23 Apr 198653.2InstalledBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
30 Sep 198653.6AppointedBishop of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola, Italy
8 Sep 199865.6ResignedBishop of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola, Italy
13 Jan 202187.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Cecchini
Bishop Mario Cecchini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiticchio di Arcevia, Diocese of Senigallia
Ordained DeaconCathedral Basilica, Senigallia, Diocese of Senigallia
Ordained PriestRipe, Church, Senigallia, Diocese of Senigallia
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Senigallia, Diocese of Senigallia
Death PlaceOpera Pia Mastai Ferretti, Senigallia, Diocese of Senigallia
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Cemetery, Ostra Vetere, Diocese of Senigallia

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 100, Number 8,658
  • d: CB, 13 Jan 2021
  • c1/loc: AM, 17 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Jan 2021

Quantcast