Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafín Luis Alberto Cartagena Ocaña, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zamora en Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Gibba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1924 Born
1 Apr 195126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 May 198055.5AppointedPrefect of Galápagos, Ecuador
10 Sep 198257.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Zamora, Ecuador
10 Sep 198257.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gibba
2 Feb 198358.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gibba
1 Feb 200378.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Zamora en Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Serafín Luis Alberto Cartagena Ocaña
Bishop Serafín Luis Alberto Cartagena Ocaña O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zamora en Ecuador

EventPlace
Birth PlacePixan, Spain
Ordained BishopSt. Francis, Church, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Zamora en Ecuador.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,089

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast