Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriano Caprioli

Bishop Emeritus of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1936 Born
28 Jun 195923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
27 Jun 199862.1AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy
12 Sep 199862.3Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy
20 Sep 199862.3InstalledBishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy
29 Sep 201276.3RetiredBishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adriano Caprioli (VIAF: 59109396)
Bishop Adriano Caprioli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolbiate Olona, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,424
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • i: CB, 31 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast