Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Bordi, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Mutugenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1946 Born
16 Jul 196317.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1 Nov 196923.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Nov 197024.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
4 Jul 197125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 Nov 201064.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
6 Nov 201064.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutugenna
20 Jan 201165.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mutugenna
22 Feb 202074.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
11 Feb 202175.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
11 Feb 202175.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Roberto Bordi
Bishop Roberto Bordi O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of El Beni o Beni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Trinidad, Vicariate Apostolic of Trinidad, Colombia

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of El Beni o Beni.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,938
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,011, Number 6
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: CB, 22 Feb 2020
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Feb 2021

Quantcast