Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Toussaint Iluku Bolumbu, M.S.C.

Bishop of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1964 Born
1994²29.1Perpetual VowsMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
23 Jul 199530.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
13 May 201954.4AppointedBishop of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Jul 201954.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Toussaint Iluku Bolumbu
Bishop Toussaint Iluku Bolumbu M.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Bokungu-Ikela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonieka, Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro
Ordained PriestBoende
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Marial, Shrine, Bokungu, Diocese of Bokungu-Ikela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bokungu-Ikela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2019
  • c1: CB, 13 May 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 17 May 2019
  • c34: AM, 29 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast