Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Apollinaris William Baumgartner, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1899Born
30 May 192626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Aug 194546.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
25 Aug 194546.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
18 Sep 194546.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
13 Jan 194747.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Okinawa and the Southern Islands (Ryukyus), Japan
21 Jan 194949.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Okinawa and the Southern Islands (Ryukyus), Japan
14 Oct 196566.2AppointedBishop of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
18 Dec 197071.4DiedBishop of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Apollinaris William Baumgartner
Bishop Apollinaris William Baumgartner O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Agaña

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCollege Point, NY, USA
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York, USA

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1945, Number 51
  • o525: CB, 27 Jan 2018
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast