Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elias James Manning, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1938Born
30 Oct 196527.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
14 Mar 199051.9AppointedBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
13 May 199052.0Ordained BishopBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
12 Feb 201475.8RetiredBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
13 Oct 201981.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Elias James Manning
Bishop Elias James Manning O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valença

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroy
Death PlaceUniversitário de Vassouras, Hospital, Vassouras

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,066
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2014
  • d: CB, 14 Oct 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Dec 2020

Quantcast