Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Jesús Patricio Baladrón Valdés

Bishop Emeritus of Guantánamo-Baracoa, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1945 Born
2 Apr 197732.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
16 Nov 199146.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
16 Nov 199146.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cibaliana
5 Jan 199246.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cibaliana
24 Jan 199852.8AppointedBishop of Guantánamo-Baracoa, Cuba
13 Dec 200661.7ResignedBishop of Guantánamo-Baracoa, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Carlos Jesús Patricio Baladrón Valdés
Bishop Carlos Jesús Patricio Baladrón Valdés (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Guantánamo-Baracoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampechuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guantánamo-Baracoa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,652
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast