Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lambert Bainomugisha

Archbishop of Mbarara, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1961 Born
13 Jul 199130.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mbarara, Uganda
2 Jul 200543.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mbarara, Uganda
2 Jul 200543.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
1 Oct 200544.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
25 Apr 202058.7AppointedArchbishop of Mbarara, Uganda
20 Jun 202058.9InstalledArchbishop of Mbarara, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Lambert Bainomugisha
Archbishop Lambert Bainomugisha (born ) Archbishop of Mbarara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKashumba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mbarara, Archdiocese of Mbarara

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mbarara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,982
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2020
  • i: CB, 12 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast