Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Edward Baharagate Akiiki

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hoima, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1930Born
7 Dec 195828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Portal, Uganda
9 Aug 196535.4IncardinatedPriest of Hoima, Uganda
7 Jul 196939.3AppointedBishop of Hoima, Uganda
1 Aug 196939.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hoima, Uganda
5 Oct 196939.6InstalledBishop of Hoima, Uganda
9 Mar 199161.0ResignedBishop of Hoima, Uganda
5 Apr 202393.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Hoima, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Albert Edward Baharagate Akiiki
(VIAF: 15157701590344220382; WikiData: Q11850584)
Bishop Albert Edward Baharagate Akiiki (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hoima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyamigisa village, Masindi, Diocese of Fort Portal
Ordained PriestChurch, Nyamigisa village, Masindi, Diocese of Fort Portal
Ordained BishopKololo Terrace, Kampala, Archdiocese of Kampala
Death PlaceNsambya, Hospital, Kampala, Archdiocese of Kampala

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 53.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 226
  • d: CB, 5 Apr 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 6 Apr 2023