Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Bayter Abud, M.X.Y. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Inírida, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Sucarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1933Born
21 Oct 195623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
30 Nov 199663.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Inírida, Colombia
30 Nov 199663.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sucarda
16 Feb 199763.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sucarda
3 Dec 201380.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Inírida, Colombia
21 Aug 202086.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Inírida, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bayter Abud
Bishop Antonio Bayter Abud M.X.Y. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Inírida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Banco
Ordained Bishopcollège La Inmaculada, Chapel, Medellín, Archdiocese of Medellín
Death PlaceMedellín, Archdiocese of Medellín

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,925
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2013
  • d: CB, 21 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast