Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop JosÚ Arana Berruete, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prelate of Chota, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1923Born
6 Apr 194623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
24 Jan 197955.8AppointedPrelate of Chota, Peru
20 May 197956.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Chota, Peru
27 Oct 199269.5DiedPrelate of Chota, Peru

MicroData Summary for JosÚ Arana Berruete
Bishop JosÚ Arana Berruete O.A.R. (born , died ) Prelate of Chota

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarbarin, Spain
Ordained BishopArena, Chota, Territorial Prelature of Chota

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast