Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Edgardo Fabián Antúnez-Percíncula Kaenel, S.J.

Bishop-Elect of San José de Mayo, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1969 Born
1994²24.6EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
29 Jul 200637.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Mar 201545.8Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
30 Jun 202152.1AppointedBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay
15 Aug 202152.2Ordained BishopBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edgardo Fabián Antúnez-Percíncula Kaenel
Father Edgardo Fabián Antúnez-Percíncula Kaenel S.J. (born ) Bishop-Elect of San José de Mayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceResistencia, Diocese of Resistencia, Argentina
Ordained PriestMontevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopNational Sanctuary of San José, Cathedral Basilica, San José de Mayo, Diocese of San José de Mayo

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of San José de Mayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 19 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Jul 2021

Quantcast