Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Amihere Essuah

Deceased

Bishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1908Born
13 Dec 194234.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Coast, Ghana
24 Feb 196253.5AppointedBishop of Kumasi, Ghana
17 Jun 196253.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kumasi, Ghana
20 Nov 196961.2AppointedBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
15 Mar 197061.5InstalledBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
6 Oct 198072.1DiedBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Joseph Amihere Essuah
Bishop Joseph Amihere Essuah (born , died ) Bishop of Sekondi-Takoradi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeyin Apolonia
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Kumasi, Diocese of Kumasi

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 79
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast