Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Folorunsho Clement Alonge

Bishop Emeritus of Ondo, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1935 Born
29 Jun 196328.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 197338.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ondo, Nigeria
17 Dec 197338.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thignica
21 Apr 197439.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thignica
31 May 197641.2AppointedBishop of Ondo, Nigeria
26 Nov 201075.7RetiredBishop of Ondo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Francis Folorunsho Clement Alonge
Bishop Francis Folorunsho Clement Alonge (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ondo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdo-Ekiti
Ordained BishopSacred Heart of Jesus, Cathedral, Akure

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ondo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r (false): Bollettino, 6 May 2010
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,415

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast