Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio 聲gel Algora Hernando

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Real, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1940Born
23 Dec 196727.2Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
11 Jul 198544.7AppointedBishop of Teruel y Albarrac璯, Spain
29 Sep 198544.9Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel y Albarrac璯, Spain
20 Mar 200362.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Real, Spain
8 Apr 201675.5RetiredBishop of Ciudad Real, Spain
15 Oct 202080.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Real, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio 聲gel Algora Hernando
Bishop Antonio 聲gel Algora Hernando (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Real

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Vilue鎙
Death PlaceLa Paz, Hospital, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa隳l, Volume 1,868, Page 148, Number 582
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2016
  • d: CB, 15 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 16 Oct 2020

Quantcast