Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Adegboyega Olawoore

Bishop of Ilorin, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1961 Born
3 Oct 199230.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oyo, Nigeria
4 Apr 201856.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ilorin, Nigeria
13 Jul 201856.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ilorin, Nigeria
11 Jun 201957.5SucceededBishop of Ilorin, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Paul Adegboyega Olawoore
Bishop Paul Adegboyega Olawoore (born ) Bishop of Ilorin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIkuri, Prefecture Apostolic of Oyo
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Ilorin, Diocese of Ilorin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ilorin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 May 2018
  • c3: CB, 13 Jul 2018
  • c4: CB, 14 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,818
  • s: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast