Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mirosław Adamczyk

Apostolic Nuncio to Argentina

Titular Archbishop of Otriculum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1962 Born
16 May 198724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gdańsk, Poland
22 Feb 201350.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liberia
22 Feb 201350.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Otriculum
27 Apr 201350.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Otriculum
8 Jun 201350.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gambia
21 Sep 201351.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sierra Leone
12 Aug 201755.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
22 Feb 202057.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina

MicroData Summary for Mirosław Adamczyk (VIAF: 607151778200618130000)
Archbishop Mirosław Adamczyk (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Argentina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGdańsk, Diocese of Gdańsk, Poland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gdańsk, Archdiocese of Gdańsk, Poland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Argentina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2013
  • ob/c23: CB, 1 Apr 2013
  • c4: CB, 17 Apr 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,773
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Aug 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast