Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Bonifacio Panella

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Mar 1392AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
23 Apr 1392Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
15 May 1395AppointedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania
16 May 1399AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Capaccio, Italy
23 Feb 1407AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Muro Lucano, Italy
1417DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bonifacio Panella
Archbishop Giovanni Bonifacio Panella (died 1417) Bishop of Muro Lucano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,808
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast