Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giorgio Labella, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of DurrŽs (Durazzo), Albania

Titular Archbishop of Anazarbus


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Oct 1840AppointedBishop of SapŽ, Albania
10 Jan 1841Ordained BishopBishop of SapŽ, Albania
26 Nov 1844AppointedArchbishop of DurrŽs (Durazzo), Albania
4 Jun 1847ResignedArchbishop of DurrŽs (Durazzo), Albania
4 Jun 1847AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
27 Oct 1860DiedArchbishop Emeritus of DurrŽs (Durazzo), Albania

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Labella
Archbishop Giorgio Labella O.F.M. Ref. (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of DurrŽs (Durazzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNarni
Ordained BishopShkodrŽ, Diocese of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 98
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 182, and Page 334
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1841, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast