Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Galata

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Sep 1803AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
9 Sep 1803AppointedTitular Bishop of Taenarum
3 Jun 1804Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taenarum
1808²SucceededArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
12 Aug 1836DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Galata:
Archbishop Paul Galata (died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 182, and Page 356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015