Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Quirini

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1491AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
1495¹AppointedArchbishop of Craina, Albania
27 Nov 1499AppointedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania
1 Aug 1505DiedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Quirini
Archbishop Francesco Quirini (died ) Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 236, and Page 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 4 Oct 2018

Quantcast