Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jacy Diniz Rocha

Bishop-Elect of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1958 Born
10 Dec 198325.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil
26 May 198425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil
23 Jan 200647.3IncardinatedPriest of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 May 201758.6AppointedBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
8 Jul 201758.7Ordained BishopBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jacy Diniz Rocha
Father Jacy Diniz Rocha (born ) Bishop-Elect of São Luíz de Cáceres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão João Evangelista, Diocese of Guanhães, Minas Gerais
Ordained DeaconSão João Batista, Cathedral, Barreiras, Diocese of Barreiras, Bahia
Ordained Priestdistrito de Nelson de Sena, São João Evangelista, Diocese of Guanhães, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopSão Miguel de Guanhães, Cathedral, Guanhães, Diocese of Guanhães, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 May 2017
  • od/c01/loc/ob: CB, 10 May 2017
  • c2+: CB, 11 May 2017
  • c2+: CB, 20 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jun 2017