Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Agustín Molina y Villafañe

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Salta

Titular Bishop of Camachus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1773BornSan Miguel de Tucumán
23 Oct 179623.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Nov 179623.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 183662.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Salta, Argentina
11 Jul 183662.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
7 May 183763.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camachus
1 Oct 183865.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Salta, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Agustín Molina y Villafañe:
Bishop José Agustín Molina y Villafañe (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Salta

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 129, and Page 330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013