Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jobst Edmund von Brabeck

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1619Born
3 Jul 166747.6Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
19 Jul 168868.6SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
29 Nov 168869.0ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
3 Jul 168969.6Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
10 May 169777.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
13 Aug 170282.7DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jobst Edmund von Brabeck
Bishop Jobst Edmund von Brabeck (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLetmathe

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 221
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018