Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich von Tietzen-Schlütter

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Titular Bishop of Ioppe

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626¹BornHannover
166943.0Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
12 Dec 167751.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
12 Dec 167751.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
1678¹52.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
4 Aug 168761.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
4 Nov 169670.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Tietzen-Schlütter:
Bishop Friedrich von Tietzen-Schlütter (born 1626, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 229
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015