Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valerio Maccioni

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628¹BornSan Marino
28 Apr 166739.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
17 Sep 166840.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
21 Apr 166941.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
5 Sep 167648.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valerio Maccioni:
Bishop Valerio Maccioni (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 257
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015