Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Anthony Gomes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mymensingh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1931BornRangamatia
20 Dec 195928.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 198756.1AppointedBishop of Mymensingh, Bangladesh
8 Sep 198756.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mymensingh, Bangladesh
15 Jul 200675.3RetiredBishop of Mymensingh, Bangladesh
17 Feb 201179.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Mymensingh, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Francis Anthony Gomes:
Bishop Francis Anthony Gomes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mymensingh

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2006
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,263
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013