Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Khulna

Dioecesis Khulnensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • James Romen Boiragi, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 14 June 1956
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Chittagong
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bangladesh
  • Square Kilometers: 28,236 (10,906 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Main Road, Sonadanga, Khulna 9000, Bangladesh
  • Telephone: (041)73.05.69

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Jessore
3 January 1952ErectedDiocese of Jessore (erected)
Diocese of Khulna
14 June 1956Name ChangedDiocese of Jessore Diocese of Khulna
2 February 2017Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Khulna (from Dhaka)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Khulna
196913,6697,381,378.2%1151685418208ap1971
198019,64711,873,000.2%2222481824468ap1981
199021,59115,920,000.1%7273463533749ap1991
199926,28914,717,000.2%182543611359611ap2000
200026,71514,717,000.2%181937722288811ap2001
200127,37914,717,000.2%2118397022710211ap2002
200227,96714,717,000.2%201838735269711ap2003
200328,66514,717,000.2%1920397352810711ap2004
200429,09314,717,000.2%1922417092910111ap2005
200630,05614,717,000.2%19214075132711011ap2007
201334,92116,185,930.2%251843812239711ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_d, v3.1.8, 21 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Feb 2017