Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Barishal

Dioecesis Barisalensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 28 December 2018
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Chattogram
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bangladesh
  • Square Kilometers: 20,708 (7,998 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bangladesh

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Barisal
29 December 2015ErectedDiocese of Chittagong Diocese of Barisal (erected)
2 February 2017Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Barisal (from Dhaka)
Diocese of Barishal
28 December 2018Name ChangedDiocese of Barisal Diocese of Barishal

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Barishal
201529,68515,183,927.2%136191,56210295ap2016

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.7, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Mar 2019

Quantcast