Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Zorzi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Chalcis in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1654BornVenetiis
2 Jun 170551.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 172671.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Chalcis in Syria

MicroData Summary for Pietro Zorzi:
Bishop Pietro Zorzi (born ) Titular Bishop of Chalcis in Syria

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015