Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Bruti

Deceased

Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1682³Born
26 Jun 170725.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 172846.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
28 Nov 172846.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
28 Sep 173351.3AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
Oct 1747³65.3DiedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Bruti
Bishop Agostino Bruti (born , died Oct 1747) Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapo d’Istria

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 73
  • ob/c2+: AT, 24 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 53
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast