Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Zhang Xianwang

Archbishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1965 Born
Dec 1990³25.8Ordained PriestPriest
2002²36.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China
29 Apr 200439.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China
19 May 200843.3AppointedArchbishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zhang Xianwang
Archbishop Joseph Zhang Xianwang (born ) Archbishop of Jinan [Tsinan]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePingyang
Ordained BishopCathedral, Hongjialou

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 21 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,581

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast