Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konstanty Leon Sosnowski, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

Titular Bishop of Arethusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1722³BornJanów
29 Mar 175532.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
16 Feb 176744.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
16 Feb 176744.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
30 Mar 176744.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
16 Jun 178058.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konstanty Leon Sosnowski:
Bishop Konstanty Leon Sosnowski O.S.P.P.E. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 98, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,888

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 16 Oct 2013