Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Francesco Antonio Correr, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1676Born
16 Apr 173053.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Dec 173458.2AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
30 Jan 173558.3Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
17 May 174164.6DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Correr:
Patriarch Francesco Antonio Correr O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 11.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013