Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Kingsley Wickramasinghe

Bishop of Galle, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1962 Born
5 Aug 198926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Galle, Sri Lanka
27 May 201148.7AppointedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
31 Aug 201149.0Ordained BishopBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Raymond Kingsley Wickramasinghe
Bishop Raymond Kingsley Wickramasinghe (born ) Bishop of Galle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUthuwankanda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Galle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2011
  • c1/ob: CB, 1 Jun 2011
  • c2+: CB, 8 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast