Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian Noel Emmanuel

Bishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1960 Born
12 Mar 198524.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
21 May 198625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
3 Jun 201554.4AppointedBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka
25 Jul 201554.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka
26 Jul 201554.5InstalledBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Christian Noel Emmanuel
Bishop Christian Noel Emmanuel (born ) Bishop of Trincomalee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrincomalee

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trincomalee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2015
  • ob: CB, 28 Jun 2015
  • c2+: CB, 23 Jul 2015
  • i: CB, 29 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,552

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018