Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Don Sylvester Wewitavidanelage

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galle, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1924Born
23 Mar 195631.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Oct 198257.8AppointedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
11 Dec 198258.0Ordained BishopBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
199570.0ResignedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
9 Nov 199570.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Galle, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Don Sylvester Wewitavidanelage
Bishop Don Sylvester Wewitavidanelage (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiripola

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast