Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Franz Drepper

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1787Born
9 Dec 180922.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
13 Dec 180922.1Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
182436.2IncardinatedPriest of Paderborn, Germany
11 Jan 184557.2SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
21 Apr 184557.5ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
13 Jul 184557.7Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
5 Nov 185568.0DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Franz Drepper (VIAF: 27815889)
Bishop Johann Franz Drepper (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMellrich, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paderborn, Diocese of Paderborn

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 296
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast