Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Nicholas Ward

Deceased

Bishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1857Born
8 Oct 188225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
22 Mar 191760.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
22 Mar 191760.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
10 Apr 191760.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
20 Jul 191760.4AppointedBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
21 Jan 192062.9DiedBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Nicholas Ward (VIAF: 73421214)
Bishop Bernard Nicholas Ward (born , died ) Bishop of Brentwood

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOld Hall, Herts

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 92
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 209, and Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018