Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Léon Wagener

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Luxembourg

Titular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1962 Born
30 Jan 198825.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Luxembourg
2 Jul 198826.2Ordained PriestPriest of Luxembourg
24 Jul 201957.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luxembourg
24 Jul 201957.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
29 Sep 201957.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Léon Wagener
Father Léon Wagener (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Luxembourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEttelbruck
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de Luxembourg, Cathedral, Luxembourg, Archdiocese of Luxembourg

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Luxembourg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2019
  • od/c01: CB, 24 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 31 Jul 2019

Quantcast