Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Anthony A. van Lieshout, C.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lae, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1932Born
12 Jul 195927.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
15 Nov 196634.6AppointedBishop of Lae, Papua New Guinea
5 Mar 196734.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lae, Papua New Guinea
15 Jan 200774.8RetiredBishop of Lae, Papua New Guinea
24 Dec 200977.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Lae, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Henry Anthony A. van Lieshout
Bishop Henry Anthony A. van Lieshout C.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lae

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenlo, Netherlands

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2007
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Oct 2018

Quantcast