Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fernando Cardinal Niño de Guevara

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1541²Born
5 Jun 159655.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Apr 159756.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Biagio dell’Anello
8 Jan 159958.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
27 Sep 159958.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
10 Oct 159958.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
30 Apr 160160.3AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
8 Jan 160968.0DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Niño de Guevara (VIAF: 18555265)
Fernando Cardinal Niño de Guevara (born 1541, died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopS. Maria degli Angeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Buried Place (Original)Jesuit, Church, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
  • a cardinal for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279, and Page 204
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 113, Number 716
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Dec 2017