Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urban Trennbach

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1525Born
18 Aug 156136.2SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
19 Nov 156136.5ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
5 Apr 156236.9Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
9 Aug 159873.2DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Urban Trennbach (VIAF: 74639178)
Bishop Urban Trennbach (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Martin
Ordained BishopPassau, Diocese of Passau

  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast