Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Delfino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza

Cardinal-Priest of San Carlo ai Catinari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1545BornVenice
24 Nov 160357.9AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
27 Dec 160358.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
9 Jun 160458.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 160458.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
1 Jun 160559.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
1606²60.0ResignedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
23 Jun 162175.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
23 Aug 162276.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Carlo ai Catinari
25 Nov 162276.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Vicenza, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Delfino:
Giovanni Cardinal Delfino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
  • a cardinal for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 7, and Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015