Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolás Joaquín de Arteta y Calisto

Deceased

Archbishop of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1771³BornQuito
17 Apr 180332.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 183362.5AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
25 Mar 183564.1Ordained BishopBishop of Quito, Ecuador
13 Jan 184876.9AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
6 Sep 184978.6DiedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Joaquín de Arteta y Calisto (VIAF: 45554258)
Archbishop Nicolás Joaquín de Arteta y Calisto (born , died ) Archbishop of Quito

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 317
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016