Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philips-Erard van der Noot

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1639³BornUccle
24 Aug 166728.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Aug 166728.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 169455.7AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
27 Dec 169455.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
3 Feb 173090.9DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philips-Erard van der Noot:
Bishop Philips-Erard van der Noot (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 208
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015