Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Paul García Peláez

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1785BornSan Juan Sacatepéquez
1809¹23.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 184357.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Guatemala
27 Jan 184357.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bostra
11 Feb 184458.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Bostra
10 Nov 184560.6SucceededArchbishop of Guatemala
Jan 1867³81.7DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paul García Peláez:
Archbishop Francisco de Paul García Peláez (born ) Archbishop of Guatemala

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,533
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 116, and Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013