Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher Henry Toohey

Bishop Emeritus of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1952 Born
21 Aug 198230.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
9 Jul 200149.2AppointedBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
30 Aug 200149.3Ordained BishopBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
9 Jun 200957.1ResignedBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia

MicroData Summary for Christopher Henry Toohey
Bishop Christopher Henry Toohey (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Wilcannia-Forbes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalmain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wilcannia-Forbes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,031
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast