Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joale Tlhomola, S.C.P.

Bishop of Mohale’s Hoek, Lesotho

Note/Previous Titular See: (Istituto Secolare Servants of Christ the Priest)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1966 Born
1995²28.8Perpetual VowsMember
28 Mar 199832.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 201447.9AppointedBishop of Mohale’s Hoek, Lesotho
10 May 201448.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mohale’s Hoek, Lesotho

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Joale Tlhomola
Bishop John Joale Tlhomola S.C.P. (born ) Bishop of Mohale’s Hoek

EventPlace
Birth PlacePulane Ha Mosiuoa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mohale’s Hoek.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast